The company described below has been deregistered. Searchlight Management Pty Ltd was a limited by shares, Australian proprietary company. This corporation was given an Australian Company Number - 145575024 and an Australian Business Number - 11145575024. On 2017-04-18, the company relocated its headquarters to NSW, post code 2030. Previous hq addresses include NSW 2000 (from 2014-12-19 to 2017-04-18), NSW 2000 (from 2010-08-31 to 2014-12-19). Registered for GST on 2010-09-01 (up until 2016-06-29) (it has to be noted that the ABR has stopped collecting or updating trading names). Searchlight Management Pty Ltd was de-registered on 2017-12-20. The information provided above originates from the ABN database
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Cancelled | 2017/10/18 | current |
Active | 2010/08/31 | 2017/10/18 |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Searchlight Management Pty Ltd | 2011/02/09 | current |
Voyager Management Pty Ltd | 2010/08/31 | 2011/02/09 |
Location | From | To |
---|---|---|
NSW 2030 | 2017/04/18 | current |
NSW 2000 | 2014/12/19 | 2017/04/18 |
NSW 2000 | 2010/08/31 | 2014/12/19 |
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Registered | 2010/09/01 | 2016/06/29 |
Advertisements
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000423557 |
Appointment status | Current |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2012/11/15 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Sydney NSW 2000 Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000225431~000252748 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: |
Provide financial product advice Deal in a financial product/Apply for, acquire, vary or dispose of financial products on behalf of another Deal in a financial product/Issue, apply for, acquire, vary or dispose of a financial product Make a market for a financial product Provide a custodial or depository service/Custodial or depository service that is not an IDPS |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | Yes |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000423557 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2012/11/15 |
AFS authorised representative end date | 2015/05/21 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Sydney Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000252748~000295337 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | Yes |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000423557 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2012/05/14 |
AFS authorised representative end date | 2012/11/30 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Sydney Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | Yes |
Contains public sector information licensed under the Creative Commons Attribution 3.0 Australia licence. Material on this website was obtained from publicly-accessible databases and is attributed to ©Commonwealth of Australia 2024 (http://data.gov.au, http://acnc.gov.au/ and http://abr.business.gov.au/), ©Intellectual Property Government Open Data 2024, ©ASIC - Company Register. While we try to make the information as precise and up-to-date as possible, we are aware the datasets are not always error-free. Aubiz.net will not take responsibility for any errors in the databases. The material provided should be treated as a starting point of more in-depth research, not as fact.