Golden Manly Management Services Pty Limited is a limited by shares, Australian proprietary company. This corporation was registered on 1988-05-10 and was issued with the 003510585 ACN. Its Australian Business Number is 72003510585. Since 2014-09-20, the company is headquartered in NSW, post code 2780. The previous headquarters were located in NSW 2780 (from 2013-11-26 to 2014-09-20), NSW 2780 (from 2000-03-07 to 2013-11-26). Golden Manly Management Services Pty Limited was registered for the GST on 2000-07-01. The company has also used 9 business names, namely Zenith Travel from 2011-11-04 to 2021-02-17, Christian Youth Tours from 2009-08-13 to 2015-06-03 and Christian Fellowship Tours from 2008-04-14. The above data comes from the ABN database which was updated on 2021-02-17.
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Active | 2000-03-07 | current |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Golden Manly Management Services Pty. Limited | 2000-06-01 | current |
Golden Manly Management Services Pty Limited | 2000-03-07 | 2000-06-01 |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Zenith Travel | 2011-11-04 | 2021-02-17 |
Christian Youth Tours | 2009-08-13 | 2015-06-03 |
Christian Fellowship Tours | 2008-04-14 | current |
Explore Australia Travel | 2006-06-02 | 2009-09-04 |
Springwood Travel | 2001-12-06 | 2008-03-07 |
Travelworld Springwood | 2001-12-05 | 2014-03-30 |
Travelworld Blue Mountains | 2001-12-05 | 2008-03-05 |
Fantastic Aussie Tours | 2000-03-07 | current |
Golden West Tours | 2000-03-07 | 2008-06-05 |
Location | From | To |
---|---|---|
NSW 2780 | 2014-09-20 | current |
NSW 2780 | 2013-11-26 | 2014-09-20 |
NSW 2780 | 2000-03-07 | 2013-11-26 |
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Registered | 2000-07-01 | current |
Advertisements
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000269397 |
Appointment status | Current |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2012-09-27 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Springwood NSW 2777 Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000222444~000386837 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | Yes |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: |
Provide general financial product advice only Arrange for a person to deal in a financial product/Apply for, acquire, vary or dispose of financial products on behalf of another |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
AFS representative business name | TRAVELWORLD SPRINGWOOD |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000269397 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2011-04-18 |
AFS authorised representative end date | 2014-11-11 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Springwood Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000222444 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | Yes |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
AFS representative business name | TRAVELWORLD SPRINGWOOD |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000269397 |
Appointment status | Current |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2006-03-31 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Springwood NSW 2777 Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000245631 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: |
Deal in a financial product/Issue, apply for, acquire, vary or dispose of a financial product |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
AFS representative business name | TRAVELWORLD SPRINGWOOD |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000269397 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2004-03-11 |
AFS authorised representative end date | 2006-04-07 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Springwood Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000245631 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
AFS representative business name | TRAVELWORLD SPRINGWOOD |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000269397 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2004-03-09 |
AFS authorised representative end date | 2010-06-10 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Springwood Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
AFS representative business name | TRAVELWORLD SPRINGWOOD |
Contains public sector information licensed under the Creative Commons Attribution 3.0 Australia licence. Material on this website was obtained from publicly-accessible databases and is attributed to ©Commonwealth of Australia 2024 (http://data.gov.au, http://acnc.gov.au/ and http://abr.business.gov.au/), ©Intellectual Property Government Open Data 2024, ©ASIC - Company Register. While we try to make the information as precise and up-to-date as possible, we are aware the datasets are not always error-free. Aubiz.net will not take responsibility for any errors in the databases. The material provided should be treated as a starting point of more in-depth research, not as fact.