Delport & Anderson Pty Ltd is a limited by shares Australian proprietary company. Located at QLD 4127 since 2007-12-04 the company is, as the updated on 2014-11-19 ABN database shows, registered. The company has been registered for Goods & Services Tax since 2001-07-01. Earlier it had been registered for GST since 2000-08-04 up till 2000-12-31. Known company numbers for Delport & Anderson Pty Ltd are as follows: ACN - 094036807, Australian Business Number - 18094036807. Delport & Anderson Pty Ltd has been the company name since 2013-11-05. Their official company name changed on 2002-08-02 to Invest Meant Pty Ltd. The company had used this name up until 2014-11-18. Additionally they had used Delport & Anderson Pty Ltd from 2000-11-07 to 2002-08-02, Delport & Anderson Pty Ltd from 2000-09-20 to 2000-11-07. This Australian proprietary company was previously located in QLD 4127 (from 2000-11-10 to 2007-12-04).
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Active | Fri, 4th Aug 2000 | current |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Delport & Anderson Pty Ltd | Tue, 18th Nov 2014 | current |
Invest Meant Pty Ltd | Fri, 2nd Aug 2002 | Tue, 18th Nov 2014 |
Delport & Anderson Pty. Ltd. | Tue, 7th Nov 2000 | Fri, 2nd Aug 2002 |
Delport & Anderson Pty Ltd | Wed, 20th Sep 2000 | Tue, 7th Nov 2000 |
Location | From | To |
---|---|---|
QLD 4127 | Tue, 4th Dec 2007 | current |
QLD 4127 | Fri, 10th Nov 2000 | Tue, 4th Dec 2007 |
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Registered | Sun, 1st Jul 2001 | current |
Registered | Fri, 4th Aug 2000 | Sun, 31st Dec 2000 |
Advertisements
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000248161 |
Appointment status | Current |
AFS authorised representative start date | Thu, 1st Jan 2004 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Springwood QLD 4127 Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000232703~000232703 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: |
Provide financial product advice Deal in a financial product/Apply for, acquire, vary or dispose of financial products on behalf of another |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000248161 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | Thu, 1st Jan 2004 |
AFS authorised representative end date | Thu, 29th Apr 2004 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Springwood Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000232706 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Register Name | Credit Representative |
Credit Representative number | 374984 |
Start date | Wed, 22nd Dec 2010 |
Principal business address |
Springwood QLD 4127 |
Member of | Financial Ombudsman Service |
Credit representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | Same as Registrant |
Contains public sector information licensed under the Creative Commons Attribution 3.0 Australia licence. Material on this website was obtained from publicly-accessible databases and is attributed to ©Commonwealth of Australia 2024 (http://data.gov.au, http://acnc.gov.au/ and http://abr.business.gov.au/), ©Intellectual Property Government Open Data 2024, ©ASIC - Company Register. While we try to make the information as precise and up-to-date as possible, we are aware the datasets are not always error-free. Aubiz.net will not take responsibility for any errors in the databases. The material provided should be treated as a starting point of more in-depth research, not as fact.