Australian Goodwill Foundation Pty Ltd is a limited by shares, Australian proprietary company. This corporation was registered on 1980-03-07 and was issued with the 005630366 ACN. Its Australian Business Number is 72005630366. Since 2014-09-21, the company is headquartered in VIC, post code 3206. The previous headquarters were located in VIC 3206 (from 2014-01-13 to 2014-09-21), VIC 3206 (from 2002-08-26 to 2014-01-13). Australian Goodwill Foundation Pty Ltd was registered for the GST on 2002-08-26. The company has also used 3 business names, namely Vocal Majority Australia from 2022-07-14, Silent Majority Australia from 2022-07-14 to 2016-11-17. The above data comes from the ABN database which was updated on 2022-07-14.
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Active | 2002-08-26 | current |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Australian Goodwill Foundation Pty Ltd | 2002-08-26 | current |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Vocal Majority Australia | 2022-07-14 | current |
Silent Majority Australia | 2022-07-14 | current |
Goodwill Life Insurance | 2013-07-04 | 2016-11-17 |
Location | From | To |
---|---|---|
VIC 3206 | 2014-09-21 | current |
VIC 3206 | 2014-01-13 | 2014-09-21 |
VIC 3206 | 2002-08-26 | 2014-01-13 |
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Registered | 2002-08-26 | current |
Advertisements
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000297705 |
Appointment status | Current |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2014-05-05 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Albert Park VIC 3206 Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: |
Provide financial product advice Deal in a financial product/Apply for, acquire, vary or dispose of financial products on behalf of another |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | Yes |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000297705 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2011-07-01 |
AFS authorised representative end date | 2014-04-30 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Albert Park Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | Yes |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000297705 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2007-12-07 |
AFS authorised representative end date | 2011-06-30 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Kew Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | Yes |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | Yes |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000297705 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2006-01-31 |
AFS authorised representative end date | 2007-12-04 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Kew Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Contains public sector information licensed under the Creative Commons Attribution 3.0 Australia licence. Material on this website was obtained from publicly-accessible databases and is attributed to ©Commonwealth of Australia 2024 (http://data.gov.au, http://acnc.gov.au/ and http://abr.business.gov.au/), ©Intellectual Property Government Open Data 2024, ©ASIC - Company Register. While we try to make the information as precise and up-to-date as possible, we are aware the datasets are not always error-free. Aubiz.net will not take responsibility for any errors in the databases. The material provided should be treated as a starting point of more in-depth research, not as fact.