V Trade & Investments Pty Ltd is a limited by shares Australian proprietary company. Located at NSW 2560 since 2014-09-23 the company is, as the updated on 2021-11-18 ABN database shows, registered. The company has been registered for Goods & Services Tax since 2001-09-01 until 2015-06-30. Known company numbers for V Trade & Investments Pty Ltd are as follows: ACN - 096909241, Australian Business Number - 53096909241. The Property Couple is an example of a business name V Trade & Investments Pty Ltd used. The complete list includes 3 business names. The Property Couple was the company's business name from 2018-05-24 until 2021-11-18. Other business names include The Right Financial Advice Company (from 2004-06-04 to 2010-09-08) and Mortgage Right (from 2001-10-23 to 2021-03-24). This Australian proprietary company was previously located in NSW 2560 (from 2014-01-20 to 2014-09-23), NSW 2560 (from 2008-02-06 to 2014-01-20), NSW 2567 (from 2001-06-01 to 2008-02-06).
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Active | Thu, 24th May 2001 | current |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
V Trade & Investments Pty Ltd | Fri, 1st Jun 2001 | current |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
The Property Couple | Thu, 24th May 2018 | Thu, 18th Nov 2021 |
The Right Financial Advice Company | Fri, 4th Jun 2004 | Wed, 8th Sep 2010 |
Mortgage Right | Tue, 23rd Oct 2001 | Wed, 24th Mar 2021 |
Location | From | To |
---|---|---|
NSW 2560 | Tue, 23rd Sep 2014 | current |
NSW 2560 | Mon, 20th Jan 2014 | Tue, 23rd Sep 2014 |
NSW 2560 | Wed, 6th Feb 2008 | Mon, 20th Jan 2014 |
NSW 2567 | Fri, 1st Jun 2001 | Wed, 6th Feb 2008 |
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Registered | Sat, 1st Sep 2001 | Tue, 30th Jun 2015 |
Advertisements
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000298467 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | Wed, 10th Oct 2007 |
AFS authorised representative end date | Mon, 20th Oct 2008 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Campbelltown Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000298467 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | Thu, 16th Feb 2006 |
AFS authorised representative end date | Thu, 18th Oct 2007 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Campbelltown Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Contains public sector information licensed under the Creative Commons Attribution 3.0 Australia licence. Material on this website was obtained from publicly-accessible databases and is attributed to ©Commonwealth of Australia 2024 (http://data.gov.au, http://acnc.gov.au/ and http://abr.business.gov.au/), ©Intellectual Property Government Open Data 2024, ©ASIC - Company Register. While we try to make the information as precise and up-to-date as possible, we are aware the datasets are not always error-free. Aubiz.net will not take responsibility for any errors in the databases. The material provided should be treated as a starting point of more in-depth research, not as fact.