Mc & Ly Varley Bikes Pty Ltd is a limited by shares Australian proprietary company. Located at NSW 2353 since 2019-02-05 the company is, as the updated on 2019-02-05 ABN database shows, registered. The company has been registered for Goods & Services Tax since 2011-01-01 until 2015-09-29. Known company numbers for Mc & Ly Varley Bikes Pty Ltd are as follows: ACN - 146526418, Australian Business Number - 16146526418. Bikes & Bits is an example of a business name Mc & Ly Varley Bikes Pty Ltd used. The complete list includes 1 solitary business name. Bikes & Bits was the company's business name from 2010-09-28 until 2015-04-12. This Australian proprietary company was previously located in NSW 2340 (from 2014-09-13 to 2019-02-05), NSW 2340 (from 2010-10-15 to 2014-09-13), NSW 2340 (from 2010-09-28 to 2010-10-15).
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Active | September 28, 2010 | current |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Mc & Ly Varley Bikes Pty Ltd | September 28, 2010 | current |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Bikes & Bits | September 28, 2010 | April 12, 2015 |
Location | From | To |
---|---|---|
NSW 2353 | February 5, 2019 | current |
NSW 2340 | September 13, 2014 | February 5, 2019 |
NSW 2340 | October 15, 2010 | September 13, 2014 |
NSW 2340 | September 28, 2010 | October 15, 2010 |
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Registered | January 1, 2011 | September 29, 2015 |
Advertisements
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000400166 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | February 17, 2011 |
AFS authorised representative end date | July 1, 2015 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Tamworth Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | Yes |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000400166 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | February 15, 2011 |
AFS authorised representative end date | April 10, 2015 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
South Tamworth Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000234708 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | Yes |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Contains public sector information licensed under the Creative Commons Attribution 3.0 Australia licence. Material on this website was obtained from publicly-accessible databases and is attributed to ©Commonwealth of Australia 2024 (http://data.gov.au, http://acnc.gov.au/ and http://abr.business.gov.au/), ©Intellectual Property Government Open Data 2024, ©ASIC - Company Register. While we try to make the information as precise and up-to-date as possible, we are aware the datasets are not always error-free. Aubiz.net will not take responsibility for any errors in the databases. The material provided should be treated as a starting point of more in-depth research, not as fact.