Gilbert Motors (mt Barker) Pty Ltd is a limited by shares, Australian proprietary company. This corporation was registered on 1966-06-30 and was issued with the 007661127 ACN. Its Australian Business Number is 91007661127. Since 2014-09-24, the company is headquartered in SA, post code 5251. The previous headquarters were located in SA 5251 (from 2014-03-27 to 2014-09-24), SA 5251 (from 2014-01-13 to 2014-03-26), and SA 5251 (from 2000-03-08 to 2014-01-13). Gilbert Motors (mt Barker) Pty Ltd was registered for the GST on 2000-07-01. The company has also used 13 business names, namely Barker Petrol from 2015-12-01 to 2020-04-09, Spuds Fuelstop from 2013-01-02 to 2019-05-16 and Treblig Electrical from 2012-06-28. The above data comes from the ABN database which was updated on 2022-03-17.
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Active | 2000-03-08 | current |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Gilbert Motors (mt. Barker) Pty. Ltd. | 2002-05-09 | current |
Gilbert Motors Mount Barker Pty Ltd | 2000-03-08 | 2002-05-09 |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Barker Petrol | 2015-12-01 | 2020-04-09 |
Spuds Fuelstop | 2013-01-02 | 2019-05-16 |
Treblig Electrical | 2012-06-28 | current |
Adelaide Hills Auto Rescue | 2011-09-08 | 2022-03-17 |
Europcar Mt Barker | 2005-01-06 | 2021-07-01 |
Gilbert Daewoo | 2003-02-25 | 2005-04-10 |
Hills Used Car Centre | 2003-02-25 | 2009-04-26 |
Bp Mt Barker | 2000-03-08 | 2018-07-12 |
Hills Used Car Centre | 2000-03-08 | 2001-02-01 |
Gilbert Daewoo | 2000-03-08 | 2000-12-30 |
Adelaide Hills Mercantile | 2000-03-08 | 2016-06-23 |
Mount Barker Mitsubishi | 2000-03-08 | 2003-01-25 |
Gilbert Holden | 2000-03-08 | 2008-08-30 |
Location | From | To |
---|---|---|
SA 5251 | 2014-09-24 | current |
SA 5251 | 2014-03-27 | 2014-09-24 |
SA 5251 | 2014-01-13 | 2014-03-26 |
SA 5251 | 2000-03-08 | 2014-01-13 |
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Registered | 2000-07-01 | current |
Advertisements
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000246338 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2007-05-01 |
AFS authorised representative end date | 2010-12-10 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Mount Barker Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000234708~000238292~000245579 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | Yes |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000246338 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2004-03-01 |
AFS authorised representative end date | 2009-08-28 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Mount Barker Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000234708~000238292 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000246338 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2004-02-24 |
AFS authorised representative end date | 2011-03-30 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Mount Barker Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000234708 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | Yes |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000246338 |
Appointment status | Current |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2004-01-05 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Mount Barker SA 5251 Australia |
Cross endorsements | 000238292 |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | Yes |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: |
Provide general financial product advice only Deal in a financial product/Issue, apply for, acquire, vary or dispose of a financial product |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Contains public sector information licensed under the Creative Commons Attribution 3.0 Australia licence. Material on this website was obtained from publicly-accessible databases and is attributed to ©Commonwealth of Australia 2024 (http://data.gov.au, http://acnc.gov.au/ and http://abr.business.gov.au/), ©Intellectual Property Government Open Data 2024, ©ASIC - Company Register. While we try to make the information as precise and up-to-date as possible, we are aware the datasets are not always error-free. Aubiz.net will not take responsibility for any errors in the databases. The material provided should be treated as a starting point of more in-depth research, not as fact.